Shenfield, Leisa Jayne (CPSO#: 64950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: Hillier, Leisa Jayne (used until: 06 Jul 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-3847
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shenfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. L. Shenfield ( CPSO# 64950 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
Emergency Room
75 Charles Street
Kingston ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 548-2333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEISA JAYNE SHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENFIELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009