Shennib, Hani Ahmed Fouad (CPSO#: 57643)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P.O. Box 7929 Chandler, Arizona, United States 85246
Date Received: 08 May 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015