Shenouda, Nancy Mounir Shawky (CPSO#: 84317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
80 Clementine Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0L8
Phone: (905) 451-1107
Fax: (905) 451-0933
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shenouda & Fahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shenouda ( CPSO# 84317 )
Dr. M. Fahim ( CPSO# 84105 )

Business Address:
5 - 80 Clementine Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 451-1107

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY MOUNIR SHAWKY SHENOUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENOUDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)