Sheolal, Ravitha (CPSO#: 87323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-257
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVITHA SHEOLAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEOLAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010