Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Shephard, Suzanne Dawn (CPSO#: 60774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meadowbrook Family Medicine
540 Armstrong Road
Unit B
Kingston ON  K7M 7N8
Phone: (613) 507-5400
Fax: (613) 507-7398
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE DAWN SHEPHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1991