Shepherd, Frances Alice (CPSO#: 28668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
7-812
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4522
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frances A. Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Shepherd ( CPSO# 28668 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
5-103
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4522

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES ALICE SHEPHERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHERD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1976