Shepherd, James Victor (CPSO#: 23526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1216 Queen St
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G8
Phone: (519) 396-2733
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES VICTOR SHEPHERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHERD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1979