Shepherd, Lynn Jennifer (CPSO#: 82622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 274-7831
Fax: (613) 274-3271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lynn Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shepherd ( CPSO# 82622 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1N 6C8
Phone Number: (613) 274-7831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNN JENNIFER SHEPHERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHERD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010