Sheps, Franklin William (CPSO#: 54000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4949 Bathurst Street
Suite 212
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y1
Phone: 416 6333984
Fax: 416 633 4446
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Franklin W. Sheps Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sheps ( CPSO# 54000 )

Business Address:
MCI The Doctors Office
Unit 4
800 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 7L4
Phone Number: (905) 738-6699

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANKLIN WILLIAM SHEPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1986