Sheps, Jordana Lea (CPSO#: 81294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
3rd Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6350
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anne Johnston Health Station
2398 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8666
Fax: (416) 486-8660
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordana Sheps Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sheps ( CPSO# 81294 )

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
3rd Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 351-3700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDANA LEA SHEPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006