Sherbino, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 76312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton HSC - General Campus
Division of Emergency Medicine
McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73542
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton St E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Sherbino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sherbino ( CPSO# 76312 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID SHERBINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERBINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006