Sherghin, Ahmed Saad Omar (CPSO#: 54840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 330
600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4W2
Phone: (519) 254-0050
Fax: (519) 254-2873
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed S. Sherghin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sherghin ( CPSO# 54840 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Suite 330
600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4W2
Phone Number: (519) 254-0050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 09 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED SAAD OMAR SHERGHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERGHIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002