Sheridan, Brian Leslie (CPSO#: 28493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dynacare
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone: 1-800-668-2714
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN LESLIE SHERIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIDAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Apr 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988