Sheridan, Jay Taylor (CPSO#: 71119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Colonel By
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 838-4756
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheridan-Woods Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sheridan ( CPSO# 71119 )
Dr. S. Woods ( CPSO# 72792 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue Room A6
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4581

Business Address:
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone Number: (613) 979-0969

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY TAYLOR SHERIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERIDAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999