Sherif, Abdulaziz Abubeker (CPSO#: 92629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 31 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jimma University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ ABUBEKER SHERIF may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHERIF is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SHERIF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHERIF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SHERIF shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SHERIF ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SHERIF ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2018