Sherin, John Playter (CPSO#: 15869)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003