Sheriton, Jack Edmund (CPSO#: 19226)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 9 Tullamor Drive Willowdale, ON M2L 2E9
Date Received: 05 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014