Sherker, Averell Hirsch (CPSO#: 51637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Liver Disease Research Program
6707 Democracy Boulevard, MSC 5450
Room 6003
Bethesda MD  20892-5450
United States
Phone: (301) 451-6207
Fax: (301) 480-8300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - California
USA - District of Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVERELL HIRSCH SHERKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985