Sherkin, Marc David (CPSO#: 31869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216E
2115 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 740-1832
Fax: (416) 747-3799
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC DAVID SHERKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1995