Sherlock, Mary Evelyeen (CPSO#: 85270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Pediatric Gastroenterology
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76890
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr Mary Evelyeen Sherlock may practice medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                  Paediatrics,  Division of Gastroenterology, McMaster University, in which
                  Dr. Sherlock holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Assistant
                  Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Sherlock no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accorance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires upon the folowing
                  events, unelss the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions, and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receive  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Sherlock's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatifactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  The  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes   a   decision   about  Dr.  Sherlock's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following  consideration   of   the
                        practice assessment report.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2011.  In accordance with
            paragraphs 2 and 3above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
            Reegistration Committee,automatically expire on June 30, 2018.