Sherman, Gregory Peter (CPSO#: 60299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Topsail Road Medical Clinic
644 Topsail Rd
St John`s NL  A1E 2E2
Phone: (709) 368-1822
Fax: (709) 368-6686

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY PETER SHERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2007