Sherwin, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 43983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN SHERWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERWIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986