Sherwood, Andrew James (CPSO#: 65565)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009