Sherwood, Margaret Lynn (CPSO#: 31712)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Sherwood, Margaret Lynn (used until: 26 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1990