Sherwood, William Geoffrey (CPSO#: 29104)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 17 May 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Jun 2007