Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sheshko, Nicholas (CPSO#: 61838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Montreal Road
Suite 306
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 744-3236
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheshko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lafleche ( CPSO# 45129 )
Dr. N. Sheshko ( CPSO# 61838 )

Business Address:
306 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 744-7295

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 12, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nicholas Sheshko, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sheshko to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. NICHOLAS SHESHKO
                                          ("Dr. Sheshko")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sheshko, certificate of registration number 61838, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a
                  complaint bearing File Number 103263 regarding my care and treatment of a
                  patient. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in medical
                              record-keeping at the earliest opportunity;
                        (ii)  self-study on the topic of abdominal complaints in
                              middle-aged patients with a complete written summary to be
                              provided to the College for review and approval;
                        (iii) review and written summary of the CPSO policy on Medical
                              Records to be provided to the College for review and
                              approval.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake to complete this requirement of 5 (a)(ii)
                        to (iii) within six (6) months of the date of this undertaking. 
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review, and
                        may include direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the report
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sheshko, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sheshko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sheshko, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Sheshko was the subject of a complaint regarding his care
                              and treatment of a patient. As a result of the investigation
                              arising from the complaint: 
                  
                              -     Dr. Sheshko will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record-keeping and management of abdominal
                                    symptoms.
                              -     Dr. Sheshko's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within six (6) months
                                    of the end of the period of professional education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Sheshko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Sheshko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Sheshko, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nicholas Sheshko to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 12, 2017:

Dr. Sheshko was the subject or a complaint regarding his care and treatment of a patient. As a result of the investigation arising from the complaint:

• Dr. Sheshko will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and management of abdominal symptoms.
• Dr. Sheshko’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of professional education.