Sheth, Jesal Nareshchandra (CPSO#: 87987)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saurashtra University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 13 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011