Shethwala, Nahid Khalid (CPSO#: 80221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 331
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone: (519) 822-6405
Fax: (519) 822-7591
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

485 Silvercreek Pkwy
Guelph ON  N1H 7K5
Canada
Phone: 519 821 2060
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nahid Shethwala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shethwala ( CPSO# 80221 )

Business Address:
331- 125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone Number: (519) 822-6405

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAHID KHALID SHETHWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETHWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008