Shetty, Geeta Rathnakar (CPSO#: 68553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi, Tulu

Education:University of Bombay, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health St.Catherine's Site
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-9993
Fax: 905 323 7562
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ST CATHARINES ORAL SURGERY
75 CORPORATE PARK DRIVE
St Catharines ON  L2S 3W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 704-1449
Fax: (905) 704-1448
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shetty & Shetty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shetty ( CPSO# 68553 )
Dr. R. Shetty ( CPSO# 68408 )

Business Address:
101 - 140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone Number: (905) 684-9993

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEETA RATHNAKAR SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1997