Shewchun, Jim (CPSO#: 33559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R R 4
P O Box 24
Fergus ON  N1M 2W7
Phone: (905) 854-9871
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8300 Macarthur Drive
Campbellville ON  L0P 1B0
Canada
Phone: (905) 854-9871
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

P O Box 36099
980 Central Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 6A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 854-9871
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shewchun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shewchun ( CPSO# 33559 )

Business Address:
R R 4
P O Box 24
Fergus ON  N1M 2W7
Phone Number: (905) 854-9871

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIM SHEWCHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEWCHUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1982