Shibani, Areej Ali (CPSO#: 82347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brandon Regional Health Centre
150 McTavish Ave. East
Brandon MB  R7A 2B3
Phone: (204) 578-4448

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AREEJ ALI SHIBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIBANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 09 May 2005 to 08 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 02 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2008 to 22 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011