Shier, John Dougall (CPSO#: 25620)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242
Date Received: 11 Nov 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015