Shier, Karl John (CPSO#: 18622)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Vienna, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1990