Shier, Luke Raymond (CPSO#: 81559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
EORLA Lab, Hematopathology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79101
Fax: 613-739-6786
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE RAYMOND SHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012