Shievitz, Alan Larry (CPSO#: 67835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Emergency Department
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7600
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Poly Clinic
Suite 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

89 Queensway West
Suite 312
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 281-9898
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN LARRY SHIEVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIEVITZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996