Shiffman, David Philip (CPSO#: 17660)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Mar 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000