Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Shiffman, Kevin (CPSO#: 63342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
603 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P7
Phone: (905) 235-8806
Fax: (905) 235-8807
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Shiffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shiffman ( CPSO# 63342 )

Business Address:
301 - 603 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 235-8806

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN SHIFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jan 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jan 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2000