Shih, David (CPSO#: 27392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
485 Silvercreek Pkwy North, Unit 1
Guelph ON  N1H 7K5
Phone: 1-844-264-2993 Ext. 2513
Fax: 519-836-7459
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2016