Shih, Jeffrey Gi-Gein (CPSO#: 107982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Shih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shih ( CPSO# 107982)

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Jeffrey  Gi-Gein  Shih  may  practise  medicine independently in emergency
            medicine.