Shih, Robert Hsiuh-Kai (CPSO#: 69998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markland Wood Medical Clinic
4335 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2A5
Phone: (416) 695-8878
Fax: (416) 695-2622
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Runnymede Medical Clinic
2213 Bloor Street West
Unit 208
Toronto ON  M6S 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 800-9697
Fax: (416) 695-2622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Keele Station Medical Clinic
1640 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 900-2143
Fax: (416) 695-2622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert H. Shih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shih ( CPSO# 69998 )

Business Address:
Markland Wood Medical Clinic
4335 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2A5
Phone Number: (416) 695-8878

Business Address:
1643 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1A7
Phone Number: (416) 900-2143

Business Address:
208 - 2213 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 800-9697

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HSIUH-KAI SHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998