Shilletto, Maurice Derek (CPSO#: 20502)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 610 Bullock Dr Unit 1212 Markham, ON L3R 0G1
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017