Shillingford-Ricketts, Hazel Maria (CPSO#: 65837)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996