Shima, Noboru (CPSO#: 82824)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kagawa Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008