Shimanovsky, Ludmila Alexeyevna (CPSO#: 76868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 204
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 553-5400
Fax: (905) 553-5477
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shimanovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shimanovsky ( CPSO# 76868 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 553-5400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUDMILA ALEXEYEVNA SHIMANOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIMANOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2001 to 27 Aug 2001
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2002 to 03 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2002