Shime, Jerry (CPSO#: 19554)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerry Shime Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Women's College Hospital 76 Grenville Street Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016