Shin, Anne Yongah (CPSO#: 65315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883-2064
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Healthwise Diagnostics
12 Morgan Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 695-5665
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Oak Ridges Medical Diagnostic
Imaging
301-13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-6861
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Y. Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shin ( CPSO# 65315 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2064

Business Address:
Healthwise Diagnostics
12 Morgan Avenue
Suite 100
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Phone Number: (905) 695-5665

Business Address:
301 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-6861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE YONGAH SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993