Shin, Frank (CPSO#: 66803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitehills Medical Centre
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: (519) 472-7732
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Shin ( CPSO# 66803 )

Business Address:
Whitehills Medical Centre
1225 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6G 2V9
Phone Number: (519) 472-0040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995