Shin, Michael H (CPSO#: 82681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: Shin, Michael Hyunjung (used until: 22 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton Building 14-217
Department of Medicine
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3155
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4244
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL H SHIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SHIN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SHIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SHIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SHIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SHIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018