Shin, Sharon Lee (CPSO#: 86061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Shin Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shin ( CPSO# 86061 )

Business Address:
Unit 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 707-1777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON LEE SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 04 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011