Shin, Vincent Ho-Sun (CPSO#: 72739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shin ( CPSO# 72739 )
Dr. C. Hawkins ( CPSO# 71318 )

Business Address:
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 469-6076

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6076

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT HO-SUN SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003